Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Gower Coleman

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Port Elizabeth, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1939Born
30 Jun 196324.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 198646.9AppointedBishop of Port Elizabeth, South Africa
22 Jun 198647.1Ordained BishopBishop of Port Elizabeth, South Africa
20 Aug 201172.3ResignedBishop of Port Elizabeth, South Africa
17 Dec 201172.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Port Elizabeth, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Michael Gower Coleman
Bishop Michael Gower Coleman (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Port Elizabeth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMafeking

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Aug 2011
  • d: CB, 19 Dec 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018