Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Rosner, S.A.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Queenstown


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1908BornSchnaittenbach
19 Mar 193425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
3 Feb 197263.7AppointedBishop of Queenstown, South Africa
25 Apr 197263.9Ordained BishopBishop of Queenstown, South Africa
3 Feb 198475.7RetiredBishop of Queenstown, South Africa
8 Apr 199889.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Queenstown, South Africa

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Rosner:
Bishop John Baptist Rosner S.A.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Queenstown

  • a priest for 64.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013