Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Umtata

Dioecesis Umtatanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 January 1951
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Durban
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: South Africa
  • Square Kilometers: 22,500 (8,690 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 85, 19 Craister Str., Umtata 5100, Eastern Cape, South Africa
  • Telephone: (047)532.2829
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Umtata
30 March 1930ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Mariannhill Prefecture Apostolic of Umtata (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Umtata
13 April 1937ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Umtata Vicariate Apostolic of Umtata
Diocese of Umtata
11 January 1951ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Umtata Diocese of Umtata

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Umtata
195014,298832,0181.7%22224595715516ap1951
Diocese of Umtata
197036,862750,0004.9%626321,15135186ap1971
198046,1491,033,0004.5%819271,7093118022ap1981
199056,286918,0006.1%818262,1643216421ap1991
199976,6744,600,0001.7%1117282,7383614822ap2000
200098,8911,680,0005.9%1116273,6622314122ap2001
200162,2811,683,4003.7%1116272,3062914822ap2002
200263,4091,700,5003.7%1117282,2642712423ap2003
200362,2941,717,6763.6%1215272,3072812523ap2004
200468,1981,717,6764.0%1215272,5252816423ap2005
201073,0001,805,0004.0%1010203,65013101159ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.2, 22 Oct 2012; data: 29 Oct 2012