Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oswald Georg Hirmer

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Umtata, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1930Born
29 Jun 195525.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 199767.1AppointedBishop of Umtata, South Africa
28 Jun 199767.3Ordained BishopBishop of Umtata, South Africa
8 Feb 200877.9RetiredBishop of Umtata, South Africa
5 Mar 201181.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Umtata, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Oswald Georg Hirmer
Bishop Oswald Georg Hirmer (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Umtata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmberg, Germany

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,024
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018