Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Antônio Brochini, C.S.S.

Bishop of Itumbiara, Goias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1946 BornRio Claro
3 Feb 197326.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Stigmata
8 Dec 197327.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Stigmata
12 Dec 200155.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Jaboticabal, Sao Paulo, Brazil
3 Mar 200255.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Jaboticabal, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 Jun 200356.6SucceededBishop of Jaboticabal, Sao Paulo, Brazil
15 Oct 201467.9AppointedBishop of Itumbiara, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Fernando Antônio Brochini:
Bishop Fernando Antônio Brochini C.S.S. (born ) Bishop of Itumbiara

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Itumbiara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,142
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 15 Oct 2014