Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hélio Paschoal, C.S.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Livramento de Nossa Senhora, Baia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1927BornVargem Grande do Sul
15 Aug 195124.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Stigmata
29 Mar 196739.9AppointedBishop of Livramento de Nossa Senhora, Baia, Brazil
25 Jun 196740.2Ordained BishopBishop of Livramento de Nossa Senhora, Baia, Brazil
21 Jan 200476.7RetiredBishop of Livramento de Nossa Senhora, Baia, Brazil
22 Nov 200578.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Livramento de Nossa Senhora, Baia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Hélio Paschoal:
Bishop Hélio Paschoal C.S.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Livramento de Nossa Senhora

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013