Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Lanza Neto

Bishop of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1952 Born
31 Oct 198027.8Ordained PriestPriest of Jaboticabal, Sao Paulo, Brazil
23 Jun 200451.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Londrina, Parana, Brazil
23 Jun 200451.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Mades
19 Sep 200451.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mades
13 Jun 200754.4AppointedBishop of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José de Lanza Neto
Bishop José de Lanza Neto (born ) Bishop of Guaxupé

EventPlace
Birth PlacePirangi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Guaxupé.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,687
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast