Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilson Luís Angotti Filho

Bishop of Taubaté, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1958 Born
19 Dec 198224.7Ordained PriestPriest of Jaboticabal, Sao Paulo, Brazil
4 May 201153.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
4 May 201153.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabae
1 Jul 201153.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabae
15 Apr 201557.0AppointedBishop of Taubaté, Sao Paulo, Brazil
13 Jun 201557.1InstalledBishop of Taubaté, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Wilson Luís Angotti Filho
Bishop Wilson Luís Angotti Filho (born ) Bishop of Taubaté

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTaquaritinga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Taubaté.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,086
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Apr 2015
  • i: CB, 17 Apr 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast