Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-François Bailly de Messein

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Québec, Canada

Titular Bishop of Capsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1740Born
20 Mar 176726.3Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
26 Sep 178847.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Québec, Canada
26 Sep 178847.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Capsus
12 Jul 178948.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capsus
20 May 179453.5DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Charles-François Bailly de Messein
Bishop Charles-François Bailly de Messein (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Québec

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVarennes

  • a priest for 27.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 146, and Page 350
  • c1: CB, 18 Jan 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast