Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Philippe-François Mariauchau d’Esgly

Deceased

Bishop of Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1710Born
18 Sep 173424.4Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
22 Jan 177261.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Québec, Canada
22 Jan 177261.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
12 Jul 177262.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
29 Nov 178474.5SucceededBishop of Québec, Canada
4 Jun 178878.1DiedBishop of Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Louis-Philippe-François Mariauchau d’Esgly
Bishop Louis-Philippe-François Mariauchau d’Esgly (born , died ) Bishop of Québec

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuébec

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,698
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 200, and Page 350

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast