Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregor Maria Franz Hanke, O.S.B.

Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1954 Born
198126.4ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Sep 198329.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
14 Oct 200652.2AppointedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
2 Dec 200652.4Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Gregor Maria Franz Hanke
Bishop Gregor Maria Franz Hanke O.S.B. (born ) Bishop of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceElbersroth

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Eichstätt.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Oct 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,288

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast