Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Brasseur, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mountain Provinces (Montagnosa)

Titular Bishop of Agathonice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1903BornMarke
18 Aug 192926.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
10 Jun 194845.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mountain Provinces (Montagnosa), Philippines
10 Jun 194845.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Agathonice
24 Aug 194845.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agathonice
7 Nov 198178.8RetiredVicar Apostolic of Mountain Provinces (Montagnosa), Philippines
1 Feb 199390.1DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mountain Provinces (Montagnosa), Philippines

MicroData Summary for William Brasseur:
Bishop William Brasseur C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mountain Provinces (Montagnosa)

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a bishop for 44.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013