Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emiliano Kulhi Madangeng

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mountain Provinces (Montagnosa)

Titular Bishop of Trofimiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1927BornHapao (Banaue)
15 Dec 195326.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 197144.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mountain Provinces (Montagnosa), Philippines
24 Apr 197144.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Trofimiana
21 Jul 197144.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trofimiana
4 Jul 197952.3AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Mountain Provinces (Montagnosa), Philippines
7 Nov 198154.6SucceededVicar Apostolic of Mountain Provinces (Montagnosa), Philippines
18 Dec 198760.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Mountain Provinces (Montagnosa), Philippines
6 May 199770.1DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mountain Provinces (Montagnosa), Philippines

MicroData Summary for Emiliano Kulhi Madangeng:
Bishop Emiliano Kulhi Madangeng (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mountain Provinces (Montagnosa)

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015