Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Funaay Claver, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bontoc-Lagawe, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1929Born
18 Jun 196132.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
18 Jun 196940.4AppointedPrelate of Malaybalay, Philippines
18 Jun 196940.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Nationa
22 Aug 196940.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nationa
15 Nov 198253.8AppointedBishop of Malaybalay, Philippines
14 Sep 198455.6ResignedBishop of Malaybalay, Philippines
2 Nov 199566.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bontoc-Lagawe, Philippines
15 Apr 200475.2RetiredVicar Apostolic of Bontoc-Lagawe, Philippines
1 Jul 201081.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bontoc-Lagawe, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Francisco Funaay Claver
Bishop Francisco Funaay Claver S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bontoc-Lagawe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBontoc
Ordained BishopCathedral, Raguio City

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 40.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)
  • mn: CB, 25 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 384

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast