Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Nicolas Taffoureau de Fontaine

Deceased

Bishop of Alet


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Aug 1655³BornSens
1682¹26.4Ordained PriestPriest of Sens, France
1 Nov 169843.2SelectedBishop of Alet, France
5 Jan 169943.4ConfirmedBishop of Alet, France
29 Mar 169943.6Ordained BishopBishop of Alet, France
8 Oct 170853.1DiedBishop of Alet, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-Nicolas Taffoureau de Fontaine:
Bishop Charles-Nicolas Taffoureau de Fontaine (born Aug 1655, died ) Bishop of Alet

  • a priest for 26.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 193
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1699, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 20 May 2015