Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sámuel Hetyey de Eadem

Deceased

Bishop of Pécs, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1843Born
1 Aug 187026.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 Aug 187026.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 189754.2AppointedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
2 Jan 189854.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pécs, Hungary
1 Sep 190359.9DiedBishop of Pécs, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Sámuel Hetyey de Eadem (VIAF: 88978771)
Bishop Sámuel Hetyey de Eadem (born , died ) Bishop of Pécs

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEgyházas-Hetye
Ordained BishopPrimate's, Church, Budapest

  • a priest for 33.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 474
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jun 2017