Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Károly Emmánuel de Csáky

Deceased

Bishop of Vác


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1852BornSopron
23 Jul 187523.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Jul 187523.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Apr 190047.7SelectedBishop of Vác, Hungary
19 Apr 190047.7ConfirmedBishop of Vác, Hungary
17 Jun 190047.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vác, Hungary
16 Feb 191966.6DiedBishop of Vác, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Károly Emmánuel de Csáky:
Bishop Károly Emmánuel de Csáky (born , died ) Bishop of Vác

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 578

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013