Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Joseph Begley

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Charlotte, North Carolina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1909BornMattineague, MA
26 Mar 193425.0Ordained PriestPriest of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA
30 Nov 197162.7AppointedBishop of Charlotte, North Carolina, USA
12 Jan 197262.8Ordained BishopBishop of Charlotte, North Carolina, USA
29 May 198475.2RetiredBishop of Charlotte, North Carolina, USA
9 Feb 200292.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Charlotte, North Carolina, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Joseph Begley:
Bishop Michael Joseph Begley (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Charlotte

  • a priest for 67.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013