Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond William Lessard

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Savannah, Georgia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1930BornGrafton
16 Dec 195625.9Ordained PriestPriest of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
5 Mar 197342.2AppointedBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
27 Apr 197342.3Ordained BishopBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
7 Feb 199564.1RetiredBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
3 Jan 201685.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Savannah, Georgia, USA

MicroData Summary for Raymond William Lessard:
Bishop Raymond William Lessard (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Savannah

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 42.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 4 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 5 Jan 2016