Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Cunningham

Bishop Emeritus of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1938 Born
29 Jun 196123.3Ordained PriestPriest of Paisley, Scotland, Great Britain
7 Apr 200466.1AppointedBishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain
28 May 200466.2Ordained BishopBishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain
22 Nov 201476.7RetiredBishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Cunningham
Bishop John Cunningham (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Galloway

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaisley

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Galloway.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,600
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018