Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Alexander Spalding Warden Thomson

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Motherwell, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1917Born
15 Jun 194629.0Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
8 Dec 196447.5AppointedBishop of Motherwell, Scotland, Great Britain
24 Feb 196547.7Ordained BishopBishop of Motherwell, Scotland, Great Britain
14 Dec 198265.5ResignedBishop of Motherwell, Scotland, Great Britain
6 Dec 198770.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Motherwell, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Francis Alexander Spalding Warden Thomson
Bishop Francis Alexander Spalding Warden Thomson (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Motherwell

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEdinburgh, Lothian, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Ordained PriestSt. Mary, Cathedral, Edinburgh, Lothian, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Good Aid, Cathedral, Motherwell, Lanarkshire, Diocese of Motherwell, Scotland
Death PlaceBon Secours, Hospital, Partick, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)Our Lady of Good Aid, Cathedral, Motherwell, Lanarkshire, Diocese of Motherwell, Scotland

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 31 Mar 2018