Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franjo Salis-Seewis

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb

Titular Bishop of Corycus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1872BornKarlovac
1 Aug 189725.5Ordained PriestPriest of Zagreb, Croatia
23 Apr 192654.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia
23 Apr 192654.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Corycus
4 Jul 192654.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corycus
27 Oct 196795.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Franjo Salis-Seewis:
Bishop Franjo Salis-Seewis (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb

  • a priest for 70.2 years
  • a bishop for 41.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1926, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013