Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josip Arneric

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1912Born
1 Mar 193623.8Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jul 196149.1AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
3 Sep 196149.3Ordained BishopBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
5 Feb 198673.7RetiredBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
8 Aug 199482.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Josip Arneric
Bishop Josip Arneric (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Šibenik (Knin)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePostire

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast