Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Armando Bambarén Gastelumendi, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chimbote, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1928Born
15 Jul 195830.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
1 Dec 196739.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
1 Dec 196739.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sertei
7 Jan 196839.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sertei
2 Jun 197850.3AppointedPrelate of Chimbote, Peru
6 Apr 198355.2AppointedBishop of Chimbote, Peru
4 Feb 200476.0RetiredBishop of Chimbote, Peru
19 Mar 202193.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Chimbote, Peru

MicroData Summary for Luis Armando Bambarén Gastelumendi
Bishop Luis Armando Bambarén Gastelumendi S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chimbote

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYungay
Ordained BishopSan Martin de Porras, Church, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima
Death PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 53.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 660
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • d: CB, 19 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Mar 2021

Quantcast