Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arthur Joseph Colgan, C.S.C.

Auxiliary Bishop of Chosica, Peru

Titular Bishop of Ampora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1946 Born
16 Jul 196619.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of Holy Cross
11 Aug 197124.7Solemn VowsMember of Congregation of Holy Cross
27 Oct 197326.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
13 Oct 201568.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chosica, Peru
13 Oct 201568.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ampora
12 Dec 201569.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ampora

MicroData Summary for Arthur Joseph Colgan
Bishop Arthur Joseph Colgan C.S.C. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chosica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDorchester, MA, USA

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chosica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Oct 2015
  • ob/mn: CB, 13 Oct 2015
  • c2+: CB, 13 Dec 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,687

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast