Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Enrique Izaguirre Rafael, C.S.C.

Prelate of Chuquibamba, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1968 Born
28 Jan 199224.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Holy Cross
14 Jan 199628.0Solemn VowsMember of Congregation of Holy Cross
15 Feb 199729.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
11 May 201547.3AppointedPrelate of Chuquibamba, Peru
10 Jul 201547.4Ordained BishopPrelate of Chuquibamba, Peru

MicroData Summary for Jorge Enrique Izaguirre Rafael
Bishop Jorge Enrique Izaguirre Rafael C.S.C. (born ) Prelate of Chuquibamba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasma

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Chuquibamba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 May 2015
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 May 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,541

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast