Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aristaces Azarian, C.M.Vd. †

Deceased

Abbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Vienna

Titular Bishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1782BornConstantinople
23 Jan 182744.4AppointedAbbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Vienna
23 Jan 182744.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia
27 May 182744.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia
6 May 185572.7DiedAbbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Vienna

MicroData Summary for Aristaces Azarian (VIAF: 88681461)
Bishop Aristaces Azarian C.M.Vd. (born , died ) Abbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Vienna

  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 124
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1827, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016