Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Michael Leonhard

Deceased

Bishop of Austria, Military

Titular Bishop of Diocletianopolis in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1782³BornGrafenwörth
23 Aug 180623.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
24 Aug 180623.9Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
15 Dec 182846.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
15 Dec 182846.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Alalis
11 Jan 182946.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alalis
20 Feb 183552.4SelectedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
6 Apr 183552.5ConfirmedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
24 May 183552.7InstalledBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
19 Nov 183553.2AppointedBishop of Austria, Military
1 Feb 183653.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocletianopolis in Palaestina
19 Jan 186380.3DiedBishop of Austria, Military

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Michael Leonhard:
Bishop Johann Michael Leonhard (born , died ) Bishop of Austria, Military

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 63, and Page 177
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 216

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013