Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakob Frint

Deceased

Bishop of Sankt Pölten


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1766³BornBöhmisch-Kamnitz, Czech Republic
16 Aug 179528.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
30 Aug 179528.7Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
2 Jan 182760.1SelectedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
9 Apr 182760.3ConfirmedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
4 Jun 182760.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
11 Oct 183467.9DiedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jakob Frint:
Bishop Jakob Frint (born , died ) Bishop of Sankt Pölten

  • a priest for 39.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 216

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013