Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustinho Petry

Bishop Emeritus of Rio do Sul, Santa Catarina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1938 BornSão José
4 Jul 196526.8Ordained PriestPriest of Florianópolis, Santa Catarina, Brazil
27 Dec 200062.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brazil, Military
27 Dec 200062.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Gabii
18 Mar 200162.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gabii
14 Nov 200769.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Rio do Sul, Santa Catarina, Brazil
19 Mar 200869.6SucceededBishop of Rio do Sul, Santa Catarina, Brazil
17 Dec 201476.3RetiredBishop of Rio do Sul, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Augustinho Petry:
Bishop Augustinho Petry (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Rio do Sul

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rio do Sul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2007
  • s: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,933
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Dec 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 17 Dec 2014