Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Didier Norman Raymond Berthet

Bishop of Saint-Dié


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1962 BornBoulogne-Bilancourt
1983¹20.5Converted
27 Jun 199230.0Ordained PriestPriest of Nanterre, France
15 Jun 201654.0AppointedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
4 Sep 201654.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Dié, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Didier Norman Raymond Berthet
Bishop Didier Norman Raymond Berthet (born ) Bishop of Saint-Dié

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint-Dié.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2016
  • ob: CB, 15 Jun 2016
  • mn: CB, 23 Jun 2016
  • c2+: CB, 14 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Sep 2016