Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stefano Evodio Assemani

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Apamea in Bithynia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1707BornTripoli, Lebanon
1736²28.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Apamea in Bithynia
6 Oct 173629.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Apamea in Bithynia
24 Nov 178275.6DiedTitular Archbishop of Apamea in Bithynia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano Evodio Assemani:
Archbishop Stefano Evodio Assemani (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Apamea in Bithynia

  • a bishop for 46.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: CB, 17 Dec 2012
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 90
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015