Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Joseph V Dergham El-Khazen

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite)

Note/Previous Titular See: Ghosta des Maronites


Events

DateEventTitle
1728²Ordained BishopTitular Bishop
25 Feb 1733SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
18 Dec 1733ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
13 May 1742DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph V Dergham El-Khazen:
Patriarch Joseph V Dergham El-Khazen (died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,585
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013