Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pio Tommaso Milante, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1689Born
17 Jul 171222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
16 May 174353.7SelectedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
15 Jul 174353.9ConfirmedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
16 Jul 174353.9Ordained BishopBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
2 Apr 174959.6DiedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pio Tommaso Milante
Bishop Pio Tommaso Milante O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 154
  • ob/c1+: CB, 12 Jan 2013
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,634
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast