Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Eldoret

Dioecesis Eldoretensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 13 October 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kisumu
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Kenya
  • Square Kilometers: 9,254 (3,574 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 842, Nyerere Rd., Eldoret, Kenya
  • Telephone: (053)2063.981; 2031.867
  • Fax: 2062.004

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Eldoret
29 June 1953ErectedDiocese of Kisumu Prefecture Apostolic of Eldoret (erected)
Diocese of Eldoret
13 October 1959ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Eldoret Diocese of Eldoret
11 January 1968Territory LostDiocese of Eldoret Prefecture Apostolic of Lodwar (erected)
11 January 1968Territory LostDiocese of Eldoret
Diocese of Kisumu
Archdiocese of Nairobi
Diocese of Nakuru (erected)
3 April 1998Territory LostDiocese of Eldoret Diocese of Kitale (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Eldoret
1970107,1601,150,0009.3%2525502,143352412ap1971
1980188,0002,415,0007.8%1352652,8926410435ap1981
1990399,2002,526,00015.8%3637735,4685221740ap1991
1999300,0001,278,46523.5%3919585,1723514635ap2000
2000341,0001,482,00023.0%3815536,4333715035ap2001
2001351,0001,485,95023.6%4014546,5003616436ap2002
2002355,0001,490,34023.8%4814625,7253616736ap2003
2003367,2001,530,00024.0%4913625,9223617937ap2004
2004375,9651,560,60024.1%5613695,4483917837ap2005
2006401,7031,623,64824.7%5313666,0863621339ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 13 Dec 2011