Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sergio Osvaldo Buenanueva

Bishop of San Francisco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1963 BornSan Martín
28 Sep 199026.7Ordained PriestPriest of Mendoza, Argentina
16 Jul 200844.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mendoza, Argentina
16 Jul 200844.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusubbicari
27 Sep 200844.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusubbicari
31 May 201349.4AppointedBishop of San Francisco, Argentina
25 Aug 201349.6InstalledBishop of San Francisco, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Sergio Osvaldo Buenanueva:
Bishop Sergio Osvaldo Buenanueva (born ) Bishop of San Francisco

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Francisco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,962
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 May 2013
  • i: CB, 3 Jun 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015