Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Berni Leonardi, O.S.A.

Prelate Emeritus of Chuquibambilla, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1940 Born
29 Jun 196626.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
29 Mar 198948.8AppointedPrelate of Chuquibambilla, Peru
10 Sep 198949.2Ordained BishopPrelate of Chuquibambilla, Peru
24 Apr 201877.9RetiredPrelate of Chuquibambilla, Peru

MicroData Summary for Domenico Berni Leonardi
Bishop Domenico Berni Leonardi O.S.A. (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Chuquibambilla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBedonia
Ordained BishopSan Pietro in Ciel d'Oro, Pavia, Diocese of Pavia, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Chuquibambilla.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,667
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast