Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Volta

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pavia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1928Born
29 Jun 195224.2Ordained PriestPriest
2 Apr 198658.0AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
25 May 198658.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pavia, Italy
1 Dec 200375.7RetiredBishop of Pavia, Italy
4 Feb 201283.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Pavia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Volta
Bishop Giovanni Volta (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGazoldo degli Ippoliti

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 4 Feb 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast