Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edmond-Marie-Jean Wolff, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Diégo-Suarez


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1905BornTrogues, France
22 Jul 192823.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
8 Jul 194136.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Majunga, Madagascar
8 Jul 194136.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Phatanus
26 Oct 194136.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phatanus
13 Feb 194741.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Diégo-Suarez, Madagascar
14 Sep 195550.4AppointedBishop of Diégo-Suarez, Madagascar
11 Dec 195853.7AppointedArchbishop of Diégo-Suarez, Madagascar
13 Apr 196762.0ResignedArchbishop of Diégo-Suarez, Madagascar
13 Apr 196762.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gummi in Byzacena
24 May 197166.1ResignedTitular Archbishop of Gummi in Byzacena
20 Jan 199084.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Diégo-Suarez, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Edmond-Marie-Jean Wolff:
Archbishop Edmond-Marie-Jean Wolff C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Diégo-Suarez

  • a priest for 61.5 years
  • a bishop for 48.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013