Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gaspare Bernardo Cardinal Pianetti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Viterbo e Tuscania

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1780BornIesi
31 Mar 180424.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 182646.4AppointedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
15 Aug 182646.5Ordained BishopBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
23 Dec 183959.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
14 Dec 184060.9Elevated to Cardinal
14 Dec 184060.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
4 Mar 186181.1RetiredBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
30 Jan 186282.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaspare Bernardo Pianetti:
Cardinal Gaspare Bernardo Pianetti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Viterbo e Tuscania

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
  • a cardinal for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 398

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013