Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Giuseppe Valerga

Deceased

Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1813BornLuano, Italy
11 Dec 183623.7Ordained PriestPriest
4 Oct 184734.5AppointedPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
10 Oct 184734.5Ordained BishopPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
2 Dec 187259.6DiedPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Valerga:
Patriarch Giuseppe Valerga (born , died ) Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

  • a priest for 36.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 305

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013