Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Vincent Francis Vinyes, O.P. †

Deceased

Priest of Order of Friars Preachers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1833Born
19 Dec 185724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
16 Feb 187744.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Grass Valley, California, USA
16 Feb 187744.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Leontopolis in Bithynia
2 Jul 1892³59.4DiedPriest of Order of Friars Preachers

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Vincent Francis Vinyes
Father Vincent Francis Vinyes O.P. (born , died ) Priest of Order of Friars Preachers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVich, Diocese of Vic, Spain, Spain
Ordained PriestBenicia, Archdiocese of San Francisco, California, USA

  • a priest for 34.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017