Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ilario Alcini

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nicaea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1887Born
31 Jul 191023.4Ordained PriestPriest
25 Aug 194356.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysias
3 Oct 194356.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dionysias
27 Oct 195164.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
10 Apr 197689.1DiedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea

MicroData Summary for Ilario Alcini (VIAF: 263063944)
Archbishop Ilario Alcini (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Nicaea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMassa Martana

  • a priest for 65.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1943, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast