Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Anthony Kyne

Deceased

Bishop of Meath, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1904Born
31 Jul 192722.7Ordained PriestPriest of Meath, Ireland
17 May 194742.5AppointedBishop of Meath, Ireland
29 Jun 194742.6Ordained BishopBishop of Meath, Ireland
23 Dec 196662.1DiedBishop of Meath, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John Anthony Kyne
Bishop John Anthony Kyne (born , died ) Bishop of Meath

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLongwood

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast