Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tito Mancini

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ostia, Italy

Titular Bishop of Vartana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1901Born
25 Jul 192523.6Ordained PriestPriest of Porto e Santa Rufina, Italy
22 Dec 196059.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia, Italy
22 Dec 196059.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Vartana
29 Jan 196159.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vartana
196664.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia, Italy
4 May 196967.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ostia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tito Mancini
Bishop Tito Mancini (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ostia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast