Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe de Rosa

Deceased

Bishop of Policastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1727³BornNocera dei Pagani
28 Mar 175022.9Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 177548.5AppointedBishop of Policastro, Italy
19 Nov 177548.5Ordained BishopBishop of Policastro, Italy
1793¹65.7DiedBishop of Policastro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe de Rosa:
Bishop Giuseppe de Rosa (born , died 1793) Bishop of Policastro

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 343
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015