Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Crispin des Achards de La Baume

Deceased

Bishop of Cavaillon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1721Born
18 Sep 174524.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Feb 176139.4AppointedBishop of Cavaillon, France
24 Feb 176139.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cavaillon, France
16 Feb 179371.4DiedBishop of Cavaillon, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Crispin des Achards de La Baume
Bishop Joseph-Crispin des Achards de La Baume (born , died ) Bishop of Cavaillon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvignon, Archdiocese of Avignon

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 157
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,761, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast