Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Maria Pirelli, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Trani e Bisceglie


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1740BornAriano
1756¹16.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
9 Jan 176323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
17 Feb 177737.1AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
23 Feb 177737.1Ordained BishopBishop of Teramo, Italy
29 Oct 180464.8AppointedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
15 Jul 182080.5DiedArchbishop of Trani e Bisceglie, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Maria Pirelli:
Archbishop Luigi Maria Pirelli C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Trani e Bisceglie

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 43.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 91
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 374

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 14 Oct 2013