Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Antonio Buffa, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri)

Titular Bishop of Zenopolis in Lycia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1736BornSezze
9 Jun 175923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
18 Sep 178044.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
18 Sep 178044.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Lycia
21 Sep 178044.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Lycia
10 Nov 179458.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Antonio Buffa:
Bishop Filippo Antonio Buffa O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri)

  • a priest for 35.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 450, and Page 451
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015