Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Torti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lugano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1928BornRonco sopra Ascona
7 Jun 195224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lugano, Switzerland
9 Jun 199567.3AppointedBishop of Lugano, Switzerland
10 Sep 199567.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lugano, Switzerland
18 Dec 200375.8RetiredBishop of Lugano, Switzerland
14 Mar 200577.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Lugano, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Torti
Bishop Giuseppe Torti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lugano

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,605
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Jun 2016